EP2271174 - GATEWAY DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1580094 / JP | ||
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. Rakuten Crimson House 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo, 158-0094 / JP | ||
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAWA, Kazunori c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2024/17] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
OZAWA, Kazunori c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2011/01] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734365.1 | 23.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009JP58067 | Priority number, date | JP20080113434 | 24.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008113434 | [2011/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131174 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271174 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271174 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W92/24, H04L12/66, H04M3/00, H04W88/16 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP);
H04L65/1023 (US);
H04L65/1026 (EP,US);
H04L65/103 (EP);
H04L65/1036 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP);
H04L65/1104 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | H04W92/24, H04L12/66, H04M3/00, H04W88/16, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2011/01] | H04W92/24, H04L12/66, H04M3/00, H04W88/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GATEWAY-VORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2011/01] | English: | GATEWAY DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2011/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PASSERELLE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2010 | Translation filed | 15.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 04.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005050587 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11,13-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1853037 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,7,10,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11,13-15 | International search | [A]JP2006074555 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2006165935 (NEC CORP); | [X]WO2007045522 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]JP2008042767 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A] - SCOTT MARIN ET AL., "NETWORK ARCHITECTURE FOR INTER-TECHNOLOGY HANDOFFS USING THE MMCF", 3GPP2 TSG-A A40-20050516-019 MOT, (20050516), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp2.org/TSGA/ Working/2005/0516-Portland/TSG-A.4/A40-20050516- 019%20Mot%20MMCF%20Architecture.doc, (20090518), XP008143373 | Examination | US2007053346 | by applicant | JPH1155324 | JP2006074555 | JP2006165935 | JP2008042767 | JP2008113434 |