|
30.05.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
60 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
26 |