Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
02.12.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.05.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.04.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
29.04.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.12.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
10.12.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
03.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.10.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.11.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.10.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |