Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009131550 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009120152 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2009 | A8 | WO2009120152 | 01.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011038057 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | WO2009SG00151 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011038028 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110015569 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110013415 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011519062 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | WO2009SG00151 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2271955 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | WO2009SG00151 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102037384B | 25.06.2014 | B | CN102037384 | 27.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | WO2009SG00151 | 23.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102037390 | 27.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200951495 | 16.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008SG00136 | 23.04.2008 |