EP2274376 - OXYGEN BARRIER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Manufacturing Belgium NV Scheldelaan 482 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAI, Choon Kooi Kasteelstraat 34 B-3090 Overijse / BE | 02 /
PLUME, Denis Albert Maurice Berkendallaan 146 B-B1800 Vilvoorde / BE | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | ||
Former [2011/03] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09735438.5 | 21.04.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP54710 | Priority number, date | EP20080155155 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08155155 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009130200 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274376 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274376 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/02 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08K2201/016 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08L2205/08 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFFBARRIEREZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/03] | English: | OXYGEN BARRIER COMPOSITION | [2011/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BARRIÈRE À L'OXYGÈNE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2009 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HR | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MK | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | NO | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 21.04.2012 | LU | 21.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
LU | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 21.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8802764 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-7 *; | [A]EP0411601 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples 12,14,15A *; | [A]US2005181156 (SCHMIDT STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0122] * |