EP2280568 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2020/51] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIMOTO, Yosuke c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
AIBA, Tatsushi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Seiji c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Shohei c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2020/51] |
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
AKIMOTO, Yosuke c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
AIBA, Tatsushi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO, Seiji c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMADA, Shohei c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/05] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09735607.5 | 23.04.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009JP58038 | Priority number, date | JP20080114730 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008114730 | [2011/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131163 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280568 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280568 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04B7/06, // H04L25/03 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
H04B7/0621 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/0656 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | H04W24/10, H04J11/00, H04J99/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2011/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2011/05] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2011/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2011/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2010 | Translation filed | 25.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | IT | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | NL | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | IE | 23.04.2021 | LU | 23.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2009128604 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [E] 1-7 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 10 *; | [X] - SHARP, "PMI Synchronization issues", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081244-PMI_SYNCHRONIZATION_ISSUE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050109687 [X] 1-7 * sections I-III and appendixes 1-3 * | [X] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Investigation on PMI Indication Schemes for Single-User MIMO Precoding in E-UTRA Downlink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081037 DL PMI INDICATION FOR MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080205, XP050109495 [X] 1-7 * sections I-VII * | [A] - ZTE CHTTL, "Signaling of the Precoder for DL MU-MIMO", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081416 SIGNALING OF THE PRECODER FOR DL MU-MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050109833 [A] 1-7 * sections I-III * | International search | [A] - HUAWEI, "Overhead reduction of UL CQI signalling for E-UTRA DL", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #47, R1-063055, (20061106), XP008143399 | [A] - FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR INC, "Efficient method for feedback reduction and feedback mechanism for precoded MIMO in EUTRA", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #47, R1-063156, (20061106), XP008143400 | by applicant | - "PMI Downlink Signaling and Downlink PDCCH Format", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #49BIS, RI-073077 | - "MIMO Related DL Control Signalling", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #51, RI-074844 |