EP2283593 - WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION BY WAY OF TERAHERTZ WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/07] | WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION BY WAY OF TERATHERTZ WAVES | ||
[2013/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHAELS, Ralph Pippelstein 28 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
EINSIEDLER, Hans, Joachim Binzstrasse 56 13189 Berlin / DE | 03 /
MOERSDORF, Thomas Am Gassengarten 22 61449 Steinbach i. Ts. / DE | 04 /
KADEL, Gerhard Kölner Str. 14 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
KRAUS, Josef Ringstr. 67c 64807 Dieburg / DE | 06 /
MILCZEWSKY, Klaus Im Mühlfeld 2 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 07 /
NEUMANN, Michael Ansbacher Str. 45 10777 Berlin / DE | 08 /
BUSE, Karsten Haydnstrasse 16 53115 Bonn / DE | 09 /
BREUNIG, Ingo Orchideenweg 35 53123 Bonn / DE | 10 /
SOWADE, Rosita Orchideenweg 35 53123 Bonn / DE | 11 /
KIESSLING, Jens Trierer Strasse 62 53115 Bonn / DE | 12 /
KNABE, Bastian Argelandstrasse 108 53115 Bonn / DE | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich, et al Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich, et al Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09735880.8 | 08.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009DE00489 | Priority number, date | DE20081020466 | 23.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008020466 | [2011/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009129772 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2283593 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2283593 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/90 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04B10/90 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04B10/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG MIT TERAHERTZ-WELLEN | [2011/07] | English: | WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION BY WAY OF TERAHERTZ WAVES | [2013/35] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES SANS FIL PAR ONDES TÉRAHERTZIENNES | [2011/07] |
Former [2011/07] | WIRELESS DATA TRANSMISSION BY WAY OF TERATHERTZ WAVES | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2009 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | NO | 27.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | AT | 08.04.2014 | IE | 08.04.2014 | LU | 08.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.04.2009 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.04.2009 | |
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
AT | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 27.11.2013 | |
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2007031151 (CUNNINGHAM JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 9; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2; | [X]US6816112 (CHETHIK FRANK [US]) [X] 1,5,9 * column 1, line 28 - page 2, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US7054339 (HU YONGDAN [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 34; figures 1,4 * | [X] - STADLER B ET AL, "Terahertz operational reachback (THOR) a mobile free space optical network technology program", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040306), ISBN 978-0-7803-8155-1, pages 1710 - 1721, XP010748290 [X] 1,5 * page 1711, column R - page 1712, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2004.1367948 | [X] - JUAN C JUAREZ ET AL, "Free-Space Optical Communications for Next-generation Military Networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20061101), vol. 44, no. 11, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 46 - 51, XP011143573 [X] 1 * page 48 * | [X] - NICHOLS R, "Protocol Adaptation in Hybrid RF/Optical Wireless Networks", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2005. MILCOM 2005. IEEE ATLANTIC CITY, NJ, USA 17-20 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20051017), ISBN 978-0-7803-9393-6, pages 1 - 7, XP010901554 [X] 1 * page 2, column R - page 3, column L; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2005.1606056 | by applicant | US2007031151 |