EP2265154 - CARRIAGE FOR A CURTAIN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILENT GLISS INTERNATIONAL AG Worbstrasse 210 3073 Gümligen / CH | [2017/12] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states SILENT GLISS INTERNATIONAL AG Worbstrasse 210 3073 Gümligen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AEBI, Beat Burgstrasse 34 3307 Brunnenthal / CH | 02 /
BURKHART, Renato Denkmalweg 26 2543 Lengnau / CH | 03 /
DÜRIG, Heinz Oberer Flurweg 104 3072 Ostermundigen / CH | 04 /
INDERMAUR, Martin Weissenbühlweg 10 3007 Bern / CH | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [2017/12] |
Former [2010/52] | Nicholls, Jeremy Bovard AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 09736068.9 | 23.04.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009CH00130 | Priority number, date | CH20080065208 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: CH 652082008 | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009129639 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265154 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265154 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47H15/04, A47H23/04, E06B9/36 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A47H23/04 (EP,US);
A47H1/04 (EP,US);
A47H15/02 (EP,US);
A47H15/04 (EP,US);
E06B9/36 (EP,US);
E06B9/362 (EP,US);
A47H2001/045 (EP,US);
A47H2001/047 (EP,US);
A47H2023/025 (EP,US);
A47H2201/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUGWAGEN FÜR EINE VORHANGEINRICHTUNG | [2010/52] | English: | CARRIAGE FOR A CURTAIN DEVICE | [2010/52] | French: | CHARIOT POUR UN DISPOSITIF A RIDEAU | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 13.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 23.04.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DA]CH653537 (BRATSCHI SILENT GLISS) [DA] 1 * page 2, column R, line 17 - line 46; figures 1-6 *; | [DA]US5109910 (TORTORELLA OSMAR [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE10150777 (MOELLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1* paragraphs [0026] - [0036] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 1,2,5,11,12 *; | [A]FR2896973 (LIN YA YIN [TW]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 30; figures 1-5 * |