EP2355942 - METHOD FOR FORMING HOLLOW PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modellbau Hartmut Rüggeberg Halle 5 Kreisstrasse 24 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÜGGEBERG, Hartmut Südring 30 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 09736120.8 | 10.09.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009EP06555 | Priority number, date | DE20081049245 | 26.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008049245 | [2011/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010034406 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355942 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2355942 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/10, B21D22/02, B21J5/02, B21J5/08 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
B21D22/025 (EP);
B21D22/105 (EP);
B21J5/02 (EP);
B21J5/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | B21D22/02, B21J5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMFORMUNG VON HOHLPROFILEN | [2011/33] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING HOLLOW PROFILES | [2011/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMAGE DE PROFILÉS CREUX | [2011/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2009 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | HR | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | MK | 16.01.2013 | MT | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | SM | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | NO | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | IE | 10.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
MK | 16.01.2013 | ||
MT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
SM | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
IE | 10.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 16.01.2013 | |
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 16.01.2013 | |
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 16.01.2013 | |
HR | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
NO | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
NO | 16.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003145223 (KOORITSU KK; HAYASHI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005007997 (TOWER AUTOMOTIVE HYDROFORMING [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11173324 (MURAKAMI YUKIYOSHI) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |