EP2349824 - TWIST GRIP UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gustav Magenwirth GmbH & Co. KG Stuttgarter Strasse 48 72574 Bad Urach / DE | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUCH, Johann Eberleplatz 4 72574 Bad Urach / DE | 02 /
NENNING, Bernd Im Erzbühl 6 89335 Ichenhausen / DE | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09736176.0 | 06.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP62973 | Priority number, date | DE20081051609 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008051609 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010040747 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349824 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62K23/04 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B62K23/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | DREHGRIFFEINHEIT | [2011/31] | English: | TWIST GRIP UNIT | [2011/31] | French: | UNITÉ DE POIGNÉE TOURNANTE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004107789 (PEPPARD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-9,11,16,17,20 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] - [0033] - [0040] - [0042]; figures 1-8,9a,9b,11 *; | [X]JP2006182178 (MIKUNI KOGYO KK) [X] 1-11,16-21 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1477398 (ASAHI DENSO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1338502 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; ASAHI DENSO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0017] - [0040]; figures 1-10 * |