EP2349143 - AN INSERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Oy P.O. Box 415 20101 Turku / FI | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYYTIKÄINEN, Heikki Onkitie 2 FI-21100 Naantali / FI | 02 /
JUTILA, Ilkka Raadelmaantie 328 FI-20660 Littoinen / FI | 03 /
CALVO ALONSO, Ulla Kontiokatu 4 FI-20760 Piispanristi / FI | 04 /
JUKARAINEN, Harri Vadelmakatu 3 FI-21620 Kuusisto / FI | 05 /
TJÄDER, Taina Untolantie 2 B 7 FI-20660 Littoinen / FI | 06 /
MACLEOD, Andrew 48 The Limes Harston Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB22 7QT / GB | 07 /
NOBLE, Michael 4 Pelham Rd London Greater London E18 1 PX / GB | 08 /
WHITAKER, David 71 Allison Road Harringay, Haringey London N8 0AN / GB | [2013/20] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
LYYTIKÄINEN, Heikki Onkitie 2 FI-21100 Naantali / FI | ||
02 /
JUTILA, Ilkka Raadelmaantie 328 FI-20660 Littoinen / FI | |||
03 /
CALVO ALONSO, Ulla Kontiokatu 4 FI-20760 Piispanristi / FI | |||
04 /
JUKARAINEN, Harri Vadelmakatu 3 FI-21620 Kuusisto / FI | |||
05 /
TJÄDER, Taina Untolantie 2 B 7 FI-20660 Littoinen / FI | |||
06 /
MACLEOD, Andrew 48 The Limes Harston Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB22 7QT / GB | |||
07 /
NOBLE, Michael 4 Pelham Rd London Greater London E18 1 PX / GB | |||
08 /
WHITAKER, David 71 Allison Road Harringay, Haringey London N8 0AN / GB | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Turku P.O. Box 99 Tykistökatu 2-4 B 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 Tykistökatu 2-4 B 20521 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2011/31] | Suominen, Kaisa Liisa Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O.Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 09736608.2 | 16.09.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009FI50738 | Priority number, date | FI20080005870 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: FI 20085870 | FI20080005871 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: FI 20085871 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031902 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349143 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349143 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2349143 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F6/18, A61F6/14, A61F6/12, A61K9/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A61F6/18 (EP,US);
A61F6/142 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (US);
A61F6/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 28.03.2011 | BA | 28.03.2011 | RS | 28.03.2011 | Title | German: | EINFÜHRINSTRUMENT | [2011/31] | English: | AN INSERTER | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 20.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Actavis Group PTC ehf Reykjavikurvegi 76-78 222 Hafnarfjördur / IS Opponent's representative Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2014/12] | 22.05.2014 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.2014 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.10.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.06.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | SM | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.05.2013 | |
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | EE | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]CA1033247 (ALZA CORP); | [A]EP0191957 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [XA]DE8712168U ; | [DA]NL8601570 (FUTURA NOVA BV); | [XA]DE19815552 (RIEK SIEGFRIED [DE]) | by applicant | CA1033247 | EP0191957 | DE8712168U | NL8601570 | EP0798999 | DE19815552 | WO2007075086 |