EP2350550 - DELAYED BLOWBACK FIREARMS WITH NOVEL MECHANISMS FOR CONTROL OF RECOIL AND MUZZLE CLIMB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRISS Systems SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 35 1260 Nyon / CH | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERBRAT, Renaud Rue du Jura 12 CH-1260 Gland / CH | 02 /
ROBERT, Antoine Rue St.-Louis 6 CH-1110 Morges / CH | 03 /
JEBSEN, Jan Henrik Chemin des Chanoz 5 1299 Crans-près-Céligny / CH | [2012/27] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
KERBRAT, Renaud Rue du Jura 12 CH-1260 Gland / CH | ||
02 /
ROBERT, Antoine Rue St.-Louis 6 CH-1110 Morges / CH | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2011/31] | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 09737155.3 | 09.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009IB54435 | Priority number, date | CH20080001603 | 09.10.2008 Original published format: CH 16032008 | US20090539276 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: US 539276 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041220 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350550 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350550 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2350550 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41A5/12 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
F41A3/38 (EP,KR,US);
F41A5/12 (EP,KR,US);
F41C27/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERWAFFEN MIT VERZÖGERTEM RÜCKLAUF MIT NEUARTIGEN MECHANISMEN ZUR STEUERUNG VON RÜCK- UND HOCHSCHLAG | [2011/31] | English: | DELAYED BLOWBACK FIREARMS WITH NOVEL MECHANISMS FOR CONTROL OF RECOIL AND MUZZLE CLIMB | [2011/31] | French: | ARMES À FEU À RETOUR DE GAZ RETARDÉ AVEC DE NOUVEAUX MÉCANISMES POUR LA COMMANDE DU RECUL ET DU RELÈVEMENT SECONDAIRE | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 02.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 02.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | EE | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | EE | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | EE | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4467698 (PERRINE WALTER E [US]) [I] 1-9,11-19 * column 3, lines 42-50 * * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 46 * * figures 1-2 *; | [I]WO0227258 (ARMALITE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5-8,11-20 * page 13, line 26 - page 16, line 2 ** figures 2-6 * |