EP2373233 - HANDLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dan&Med Repair Dannoritzer Medizintechnik Gmbh&Co. KG Sattlerstrasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Dan&Med Repair Dannoritzer Medizintechnik Gmbh&Co. Kg Sattlerstrasse 25 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Michael Karpfenstrasse 17 78559 Gosheim / DE | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2011/41] | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstr. 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737356.7 | 14.10.2009 | [2016/28] | WO2009EP07363 | Priority number, date | DE20081058207 | 19.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008058207 | [2011/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010057551 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373233 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373233 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/2841 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGRIFFVORRICHTUNG | [2011/41] | English: | HANDLE DEVICE | [2011/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POIGNÉE | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2009 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | MT | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IE | 14.10.2016 | LU | 14.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.10.2009 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
TR | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.10.2009 | |
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 13.07.2016 | |
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9400059 (MICROSURGE INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * pages 11-15; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO9603930 (UTAH MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * pages 7-17; figure 6 * [A] 14; | [X]WO9811814 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * figures 10-13; claim 1 *; | [X]US5755726 (PRATT JAMES R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * columns 3-6; figure 5 *; | [XA]US4611595 (KLIEMAN CHARLES H [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 [A] 14 | Examination | FR842399 | US2632661 | US2530136 |