EP2351316 - Method and system for token-based authentication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/31] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TOKEN-BASED AUTHENTICATION | ||
[2012/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASS, Eric c/o IBM Deutschland Research&Development GmbH Schoenaicher Str. 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | [2013/01] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
KASS, Eric c/o IBM Deutschland Research&Development GmbH Schoenaicher Str. 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | Representative(s) | Klein, Hans-Jörg, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht IBM-Allee 1 71139 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Klein, Hans-Jörg, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht IBM-Allee 1 71139 Ehningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737460.7 | 26.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP64052 | Priority number, date | EP20080170167 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08170167 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010060704 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2351316 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351316 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/00, H04L9/32 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H04L29/06, G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Authentifikation auf Token-Basis | [2012/42] | English: | Method and system for token-based authentication | [2012/42] | French: | Procédé et système d'authentification à base de jeton | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/31] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTHENTIFIKATION AUF TOKEN-BASIS | ||
Former [2011/31] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TOKEN-BASED AUTHENTICATION | ||
Former [2011/31] | AUTHENTIFICATION D UN CANAL DE COMMUNICATION SECONDAIRE À BASE DE JETON DE CLIENT À SERVEUR À TRAVERS DES CANAUX DE COMMUNICATION PRINCIPAUX AUTHENTIFIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2009 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MK | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | SM | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.01.2013 | ||
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2004255121 (ECKERT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,12,15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048] * [Y] 6,7 [I] 3,11,13; | [XI]US2008127323 (SOIN TARUN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,12,14,15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0069] * [I] 8,11,13; | [XI]EP1843543 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,12,14,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 11,13; | [Y] - WOBBER E ET AL, "AUTHENTICATION IN THE TAOS OPERATING SYSTEM", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1145/173668.168640, (19931201), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 256 - 269, XP000418698 [Y] 6,7 * page 256, column l, line 1 - page 257, column l, line 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/173668.168640 | by applicant | US2004255121 | US2008127323 | EP1843543 |