EP2352700 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A SUSPENSION OF NANOPARTICULATE METAL BORIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEINE JÄGER, Frank Birkental 25 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 02 /
KOCH, Jörg Feuerbergstrasse 2 67134 Birkenheide / DE | 03 /
LÖBEL, Johannes Friedrich-Karl-Strasse 1 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737461.5 | 26.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009EP64063 | Priority number, date | EP20080167612 | 27.10.2008 Original published format: EP 08167612 | [2011/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010049382 | Date: | 06.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352700 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/04 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
C01B35/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01F23/50 (KR);
B01J13/00 (KR);
B01J19/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SUSPENSION NANOPARTIKULÄRER METALLBORIDE | [2011/32] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A SUSPENSION OF NANOPARTICULATE METAL BORIDES | [2011/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE BORURES MÉTALLIQUES NANOPARTICULAIRES | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.03.2015 | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/27] | 26.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 18.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007128821 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,8-9 * example 5; claim 1 * * page 9, line 40 - page 10, line 13 * * claim 11 * * claim 12 *; | [Y]JP2003261323 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [Y] 1-4,8-9 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006134141 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - WATANABE, TAKAYUKI ET AL, "Nucleation mechanism of boride nanoparticles in induction thermal plasmas", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2004), Database accession no. 144:55332, URL: STN, XP002567751 [A] 1-9 * abstract * |