18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
18.01.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
08.06.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
10.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
07.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.02.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.09.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
06.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2011 |
First examination report |
|
25.02.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
21.01.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
17.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|