EP2285629 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A DOOR OR FLAP OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | |||
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIMANN, Martin Seidelbastweg 5a 59071 Hamm / DE | 02 /
WEGHAUS, Ludger Am Eckernbusch 11 59556 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
MAIER, Ruben Am Gwendt 29 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | 04 /
THIELE, Andreas Brunsroder Str. 54a 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 05 /
ETTE, Bernd Leinefelderstr. 38 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2011/13] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
REIMANN, Martin Seidelbastweg 5a 59071 Hamm / DE | ||
02 /
WEGHAUS, Ludger Am Eckernbusch 11 59556 Lippstadt / DE | |||
03 /
MAIER, Ruben Am Gwendt 29 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
04 /
THIELE, Andreas Brunsroder Str. 54a 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | |||
05 /
ETTE, Bernd Am Walde 9 15537 Grünheide / DE | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09737810.3 | 14.04.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009EP02731 | Priority number, date | DE20081021324 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021324 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009132766 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285629 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285629 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, G07C9/00 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
B60R25/2036 (EP,US);
G06F7/00 (US);
B60R25/2054 (EP,US);
G01B7/023 (EP,US);
G07C9/00658 (EP,US);
E05F15/00 (EP,US);
E05F15/73 (EP,US);
E05F15/76 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/852 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/858 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/86 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER TÜR ODER KLAPPE EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2011/08] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACTUATING A DOOR OR FLAP OF A VEHICLE | [2011/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D ACTIONNEMENT D UNE PORTE OU D UNE TRAPPE DE VÉHICULE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2009 | CY | 14.03.2012 | CZ | 14.03.2012 | DK | 14.03.2012 | EE | 14.03.2012 | FI | 14.03.2012 | HR | 14.03.2012 | IT | 14.03.2012 | LT | 14.03.2012 | LV | 14.03.2012 | MK | 14.03.2012 | MT | 14.03.2012 | NL | 14.03.2012 | PL | 14.03.2012 | RO | 14.03.2012 | SI | 14.03.2012 | SK | 14.03.2012 | TR | 14.03.2012 | IE | 14.04.2012 | LU | 14.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 14.06.2012 | NO | 14.06.2012 | GR | 15.06.2012 | ES | 25.06.2012 | IS | 14.07.2012 | PT | 16.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
LU | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
TR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
MT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 14.06.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
ES | 25.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
MK | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
IT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
DK | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NL | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
IE | 14.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
PT | 16.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
SK | 14.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
CZ | 14.03.2012 | ||
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
PL | 14.03.2012 | ||
RO | 14.03.2012 | ||
SI | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
IS | 14.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
EE | 14.03.2012 | ||
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 14.03.2012 | |
FI | 14.03.2012 | ||
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
LV | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 14.03.2012 | |
HR | 14.03.2012 | ||
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 14.03.2012 | |
LT | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.06.2012 | ||
GR | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 14.03.2012 | |
NO | 14.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0770749 (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0181694 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1,7,12* abstract * | by applicant | EP0770749 | DE10361115 | DE102004041709 | DE102006015930 | DE102006037237 |