EP2300279 - VEHICLE KEY FOR STORING A VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION, TRANSMITTER FOR TRANSMITTING VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION, SYSTEM FOR PROGRAMMING A VEHICLE KEY, TRANSPORT MEANS COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF VEHICLE KEY, USE THEREOF AND METHOD FOR STORING VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION IN A VEHICLE KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2011/13] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÄHLIN, Ulrich Lübecker Straße 4 65670 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFER, Maik Kreuzäckerring 18 88048 Friedrichshafen-Kluftern / DE | 03 /
MÖLLER, Ulrich Max-Heimbucherstraße 4 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Bonn, Roman Klemens, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09738227.9 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/13] | WO2009EP55292 | Priority number, date | DE20081021724 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021724 | DE20091017730 | 11.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009017730 | [2011/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133183 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2300279 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, G07C9/00 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
B60R25/24 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00865 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSEL ZUM SPEICHERN EINER FAHRZEUGKENNUNG, SENDER ZUM SENDEN EINER FAHRZEUGKENNUNG, SYSTEM ZUM PROGRAMMIEREN EINES FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSELS, TRANSPORTMITTEL MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSEL, DESSEN VERWENDUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN EINER FAHRZEUGKENNUNG IN EINEM FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSEL | [2011/13] | English: | VEHICLE KEY FOR STORING A VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION, TRANSMITTER FOR TRANSMITTING VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION, SYSTEM FOR PROGRAMMING A VEHICLE KEY, TRANSPORT MEANS COMPRISING SAID TYPE OF VEHICLE KEY, USE THEREOF AND METHOD FOR STORING VEHICLE IDENTIFICATION IN A VEHICLE KEY | [2011/13] | French: | CLÉ DE VÉHICULE DESTINÉE À LA MÉMORISATION D'UNE IDENTIFICATION DE VÉHICULE, ÉMETTEUR DESTINÉ À L'ENVOI D'UNE IDENTIFICATION DE VÉHICULE, SYSTÈME DE PROGRAMMATION D'UNE CLÉ DE VÉHICULE, MOYEN DE TRANSPORT ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE CLÉ DE CE TYPE, SON UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MÉMORISATION D'UNE IDENTIFICATION DE VÉHICULE DANS UNE CLÉ DE VÉHICULE | [2011/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2019 | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/07] | 29.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 10.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP19212526.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0671528 (VALEO BORG INSTR VERW GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, lines 37-57 * * column 3, lines 9-19 * * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 24 * * column 5, lines 40-53 * * column 6, lines 46-53; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4441415 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 43-57 * * column 2, lines 2-24 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 12; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0870889 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 3, lines 15-21 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 17 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 15; figures 1,4 *; | [X]EP0788946 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 3-19,30-57 * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 3 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 9 * * column 8, lines 24-30 * * column 15, line 52 - column 16, line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1325848 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0012] , [0023]; figure 1; claim 5 *; | [A]DE10233597 (BRUEHN XENIA [DE], et al) [A] 12 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050]; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US2005248436 | US2005258934 | DE10048388 |