EP2286149 - PREMIX GAS BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gas Point S.R.L. Via Alfieri 1 Loc. Sorbolo a Levante 42041 Brescello / IT | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZATTI, Claudio Via Einaudi 6 I-43058 Sorbolo / IT | 02 /
RASTELLI, Raffaello Via Paganini 9 I-43058 Sorbolo / IT | 03 /
LOVASCIO, Nicola Via Vanvitelli 11 I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2011/08] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09738464.8 | 29.04.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009IB05414 | Priority number, date | IT2008BO00278 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: IT BO20080278 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009133451 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286149 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286149 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/60, F23D14/64, F23N1/02, F23N5/24 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
F23D14/60 (EP,US);
F23D14/64 (EP,US);
F23N1/022 (EP,US);
F23N5/242 (EP,US);
F23D2900/00003 (EP,US);
F23D2900/14642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | VORMISCHGASBRENNER | [2011/08] | English: | PREMIX GAS BURNER | [2011/08] | French: | BRULEUR A GAZ A PREMELANGE | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 09.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2009 | AT | 11.09.2013 | BE | 11.09.2013 | BG | 11.09.2013 | CY | 11.09.2013 | CZ | 11.09.2013 | DK | 11.09.2013 | EE | 11.09.2013 | FI | 11.09.2013 | HR | 11.09.2013 | LT | 11.09.2013 | LV | 11.09.2013 | MC | 11.09.2013 | MK | 11.09.2013 | MT | 11.09.2013 | RO | 11.09.2013 | SE | 11.09.2013 | SI | 11.09.2013 | SK | 11.09.2013 | NO | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.12.2013 | IS | 11.01.2014 | PT | 13.01.2014 | IE | 29.04.2014 | LU | 29.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.04.2009 | |
AT | 11.09.2013 | ||
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
MT | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.04.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
MC | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
DK | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
PT | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.09.2013 | |
BE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2013 | ||
EE | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
SK | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
RO | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 11.09.2013 | |
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
FI | 11.09.2013 | ||
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 11.09.2013 | ||
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
LV | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
SI | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 11.09.2013 | |
LT | 11.09.2013 | ||
SE | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 11.09.2013 | |
NO | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 11.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4861261 (KRIEGER KURT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 38 - line 43 *; | [Y]EP0559280 (ATAG VERWARMING BV [NL]) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 3 - line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE29711889U (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 1; figure 4 *; | [Y]DE19635974 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 7-9 * column 2, line 36 - line 54 * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO0210645 (JOHN ZINK CO LLC [US]) [Y] 10* page 13, paragraph 3 *; | [YA]DE10119598 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * [A] 1,7-9,13; | [IY]US6604938 (BLAAUWWIEKEL PIET [NL], et al) [I] 1-4,11-13 * column 1, line 41 - line 57 * * column 2, line 11 - line 13 * * column 2, line 22 - line 33 * * column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 1 - line 13 * * figure 1 * [Y] 5-10 |