01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
06.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
26.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
17.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.07.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
10.07.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
10.07.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
10.07.2018 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
20.01.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
20.01.2017 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
04.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.04.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
23.04.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
21.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|