EP2309202 - SOLAR ENERGY ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electra Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-7-1, Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YABE, Takashi 7-2 Higashitabata 2-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 114-0013 / JP | 02 /
SATOH, Yuji 6-21-2 Togoshi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0041 / JP | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09738820.1 | 28.04.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009JP58347 | Priority number, date | JP20080120538 | 02.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008120538 | JP20080203940 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008203940 | [2011/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009133883 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2309202 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/28, F24J2/08, F24J2/10, F24J2/14, F24J2/38, F24J2/50 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
F24S23/31 (EP,US);
F24S23/00 (EP,US);
F24S23/12 (EP,US);
F24S30/40 (EP,US);
F24S60/30 (EP,US);
F24S70/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | SONNENENERGIEABSORBER | [2011/15] | English: | SOLAR ENERGY ABSORBER | [2011/15] | French: | ABSORBEUR D'ENERGIE SOLAIRE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2010 | Translation filed | 01.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 04.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6298156 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [Y]JPH0727424 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPS60153404U (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.); | [Y]JPH05272409 (AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPS567946 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPH05302759 (KUNISHIRO KANAGATA KOGYO KK) | by applicant | JP2008120538 | JP2008203940 |