EP2275893 - AUTOMATIC VOLTAGE REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Myung Hwan 77-5 Dunchon-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-060 / KR | For all designated states CSKK(HKG) Limited 9th Fl. Yat Chau Building 262 Des Voeux Road Central Sheungwan, Hongkong / CN | [2011/11] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Lee, Myung Hwan 77-5 Dunchon-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-060 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09738922.5 | 07.04.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009KR01772 | Priority number, date | KR20080040180 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080040180 | [2011/03] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134016 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | KO | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2275893 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/14 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
G05F1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER SPANNUNGSREGLER | [2011/03] | English: | AUTOMATIC VOLTAGE REGULATOR | [2011/03] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE TENSION AUTOMATIQUE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2010 | Translation filed | 18.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 17.01.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR19980033147 (TAKARA ENGINEERING CO., LTD); | [A]KR19990028845 (N.V. ENECO); | [A]KR20060117560 (LS IND SYSTEMS CO LTD [KR]) |