EP2284879 - CAPACITOR-LESS MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-791 / KR | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jea-Gun 1003-1901 Gunyoung APT. Mujigae Maeul Gumi-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR | 02 /
SHIM, Tae-Hun 921-102 Samsung APT. Yeongtong 2-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Gon-Sub B-801 Seongbo APT. 709 Yeoksam 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-919 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seong-Je 17-101 Sampungpark Town 575-25 Geongeon-dong Sangnok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 426-210 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Tae-Hyun 414-208 Jugong APT. Sanggae 7-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-754 / KR | [2020/19] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
PARK, Jea-Gun 1003-1901 Gunyoung APT. Mujigae Maeul Gumi-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIM, Tae-Hun 921-102 Samsung APT. Yeongtong 2-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-472 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Gon-Sub B-801 Seongbo APT. 709 Yeoksam 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-919 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Seong-Je 17-101 Sampungpark Town 575-25 Geongeon-dong Sangnok-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 426-210 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Tae-Hyun 414-208 Jugong APT. Sanggae 7-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-754 / KR | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2011/07] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe Zimmermann Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Hermann-Roth-Weg 1 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09738995.1 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009KR02284 | Priority number, date | KR20080040888 | 30.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080040888 | [2011/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134089 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | KO | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2284879 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284879 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.02.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L29/78, H01L27/108, G11C11/404, H01L29/423, // G11C16/04, H01L29/786 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H01L29/4234 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
G11C11/404 (EP,US);
H01L29/7841 (EP,US);
H10B12/20 (EP,US);
H10B99/00 (KR);
G11C16/0466 (EP,US);
G11C2211/4016 (EP,US);
H01L29/78687 (EP,US);
H01L29/78696 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | H01L21/8242, H01L29/78, H01L27/108 | ||
Former IPC [2011/07] | H01L21/8242 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KONDENSATORLOSE SPEICHERANORDNUNG | [2011/07] | English: | CAPACITOR-LESS MEMORY DEVICE | [2011/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉMOIRE SANS CONDENSATEUR | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | Translation filed | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2019 | 15.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 06.05.2020 | |
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005093021 (OUYANG QIQING C [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,14,15,17 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021]; figure 1 * [A] 6,11-13,16; | [XAI]US2005285097 (SHANG HUILING [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026]; figures 1,3 * [A] 6,11-13 [I] 16; | [XAI]US2006125010 (BHATTACHARYYA ARUP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0054] - [0093] - [0103] - [0116] - [0160] - [0161]; figures 1-7,10 * [A] 11-13 [I] 2-10,14-17; | [XAI]US2007001222 (ORLOWSKI MARIUS K [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14,17 * paragraphs [0030] - [0043] - [0054] - [0055]; figures 1-4,14-15 * [A] 6 [I] 13,15,16; | [XAI]WO2007093741 (ST MICROELECTRONICS CROLLES 2 [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,14 * page 4, line 1 - page 9, line 22; figures 1-3 * [A] 6 [I] 12,15-17; | WO2009055173 [ ] (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [E]EP2206143 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [E] 1-5,7-10,14,17 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 30; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]KR19990036735 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION); | [A]KR19990057821 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.); | [A]KR20030011512 (TOSHIBA KK); | [A]KR20030034470 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]); | [A]KR20030081142 (SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC.) | Examination | US2005017377 | - JIN-WOO HAN ET AL, "A Unified-RAM (URAM) Cell for Multi-Functioning Capacitorless DRAM and NVM", 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING : WASHINGTON, DC, 10 - 12 DECEMBER 2007, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071210), ISBN 978-1-4244-1507-6, pages 929 - 932, XP031389851 |