EP2283155 - PRETERM DELIVERY DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swedish Health Services 747 Broadway Seattle, WA 98122 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Michelle A. 2527 10th Ave. West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 02 /
ENQUOBAHRIE, Daniel A. 11002 NE 140th St Kirkland, Washington 98034 / US | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Michelle A. 2527 10th Ave. West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | ||
02 /
ENQUOBAHRIE, Daniel A. 67 Thornton Road Brookline, MA 02467 / US | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739255.9 | 01.05.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US02730 | Priority number, date | US20080049709P | 01.05.2008 Original published format: US 49709 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134452 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283155 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, G01N33/68 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/689 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHER TEST FÜR FRÜHGEBURT | [2011/07] | English: | PRETERM DELIVERY DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY | [2011/07] | French: | ANALYSE DE DIAGNOSTIC D'ACCOUCHEMENT PRÉMATURÉ | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008009552 (PENNELL CRAIG [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-8,15,16 * paragraphs [0011] , [00 3] , [ 146] , [ 333] , [ 343] * * figure 1; example 1; table 1 * * claims 1-28 *; | [T] - ENQUOBAHRIE DANIEL A ET AL, "Early pregnancy peripheral blood gene expression and risk of preterm delivery: a nested case control study", BMC PREGNANCY AND CHILDBIRTH, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20091210), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2393, page 56, XP021066881 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007161125 (ROSENFELD RON [US], et al); | [A]WO2008046160 (UNIV NEWCASTLE RES ASS [AU], et al); | [A]WO2006084109 (PRO TERM INC [US]); | [A]US2004241775 (ROMERO ROBERTO [US], et al) |