|
04.05.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Notification of withdrawal of priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
76 |