EP2294061 - DISUBSTITUTED PHTHALAZINE HEDGEHOG PATHWAY ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eli Lilly & Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2011/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIPSKIND, Philip, Arthur Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | 02 /
WILSON, Takako Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2011/11] | Representative(s) | Bassinder, Emma Marie Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Bassinder, Emma Marie Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Lilly Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739376.3 | 01.04.2009 | [2011/11] | WO2009US39065 | Priority number, date | US20080048729 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: US 48729 | [2011/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134574 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2294061 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, A61K31/502, A61P35/00 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/11] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE PHTHALAZIN-HEDGEHOG-SIGNALWEG-ANTAGONISTEN | [2011/11] | English: | DISUBSTITUTED PHTHALAZINE HEDGEHOG PATHWAY ANTAGONISTS | [2011/11] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DE LA VOIE DE LA PROTÉINE HEDGEHOG DE PHTALAZINE DISUBSTITUÉE | [2011/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2005033288 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * claims 13,14,31,37,39,42,45 *; | [A]WO2006028958 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [PA]WO2008110611 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [PA] 1-12* claim - *; | [PA]WO2009002469 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-12 * claim -; compounds E.G. 2, 75 * |