EP2282719 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revalesio Corporation 1202 East D Street Tacoma, WA 98421 / US | [2018/15] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states REVALESIO CORPORATION 5102 20th Street East, Bldg. 100 Tacoma, Washington 98424 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATSON, Richard, L. 5331 N Highland Street Ruston Washington 98407 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Anthony, B. 6043 Bryan Parkway Dallas TX 75206 / US | 03 /
ARCHAMBEAU, Gregory, J. 1824 Crystal Lane Loop S.e. Puyallup WA 98372 / US | [2018/22] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
WATSON, Richard, L. 1985 Cougar Trail Mcpherson KS 67460 / US | ||
02 /
WOOD, Anthony, B. 6043 Bryan Parkway Dallas TX 75206 / US | |||
03 /
ARCHAMBEAU, Gregory, J. 1824 Crystal Lane Loop S.e. Puyallup WA 98372 / US | Representative(s) | Teall, Charlotte, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2012/13] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/07] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09739530.5 | 27.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US41852 | Priority number, date | US20080048332P | 28.04.2008 Original published format: US 48332 P | US20080048347P | 28.04.2008 Original published format: US 48347 P | US20080256774 | 23.10.2008 Original published format: US 256774 | WO2008US81021 | 23.10.2008 Original published format: PCT/US2008/081021 | WO2008US81202 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: PCT/US2008/081202 | US20080258210 | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 258210 | [2017/48] |
Former [2011/07] | US20080048332P | 28.04.2008 | |
US20080048347P | 28.04.2008 | ||
US20080256774P | 23.10.2008 | ||
WO2008US08102 | 23.10.2008 | ||
WO2008US08120 | 24.10.2008 | ||
US20080258210 | 24.10.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009134728 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2282719 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282719 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/573, A61K33/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K33/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2011/07] | A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2011/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [2011/07] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2011/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAITER LA SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2017 | 22.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2009 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | PT | 01.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.04.2009 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.04.2009 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003232114 (DEKLEVA NIKOLA [YU]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0055] *; | [Y]WO2004022098 (NAGY TIBOR [HU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document ** claim 6 *; | [Y]WO2008018932 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * claim 22 *; | [YDP]WO2008052143 (REVALESIO CORP [US], et al) [YDP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2009055614 (REVALESIO CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * * claim 15 *; | [E]WO2010048455 (REVALESIO CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 10, line 12 - line 27 * * claims 15,16 * | International search | [Y]US2004118701 (SENKIW JAMES ANDREW [US]); | [Y]US2004166171 (MCGRATH TERRENCE S [US], et al); | [Y]US2006198822 (BOOTH DAVID R [AU], et al); | [Y] - LASSMANN., "Hypoxia-like tissue injury as a component of multiple sclerosis lesions.", J. NEUROL. SCI., (20030215), vol. 206, no. 2, pages 187 - 191, XP008137062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-510X(02)00421-5 | [Y] - VAN WINSEN ET AL., "Sensitivity to glucocorticoids is decreased in relapsing remitting multiple sclerosis.", J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (200502), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 734 - 740, XP008137063 | [Y] - RUTGEERTS ET AL., "Review artide: the limitations of corticosteroid therapy in Crohn's disease.", ALIMENT. PHARMACOL. THER., (200110), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 1515 - 1525, XP008137064 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2036.2001.01060.x | by applicant | US6386751 | WO02074767 | US2004259896 | US2006287338 | WO2007087637 | US2007219217 | US2008032997 | WO2008052143 | US2008139674 | US2008219088 | US2008281001 | - MINAGAR et al., J. Neurological Sci., (20020000), vol. 202, pages 13 - 23 | - ANTEL; OWENS, J. Neuroimmunol., (19990000), vol. 100, pages 181 - 189 | - ELLIOTT, Mol. Brain. Res., (20010000), vol. 95, pages 172 - 178 | - NAKAMURA, Biol. Pharm. Bull., (20020000), vol. 25, pages 945 - 953 | - WHITTON PS, Br J Pharmacol., (20070000), vol. 150, pages 963 - 76 | - TANSEY, Fron Bioscience, (20080000), vol. 13, pages 709 - 717 | - RUFFINI, Am J Pathol, (20040000), vol. 164, pages 1519 - 1522 | - DOS SANTOS, J Neuroinflammation, (20080000), vol. 5, page 49 | - GREIG et al., Ann NY Acad of Sci, (20060000), vol. 1035, pages 290 - 315 | - PUGLIATTI et al., Clin. Neurol. Neuros., (20020000), vol. 104, pages 182 - 191 | - DUBOIS-DALCQ et al., Neuron., (20050000), vol. 48, pages 9 - 12 | - OKSENBERG et al., JAMA, (19930000), vol. 270, pages 2363 - 2369 | - OLERUP et al., Tissue Antigens, (19910000), vol. 38, pages 1 - 3 | - BRUCK et al., J. Neurol. Sci., (20030000), vol. 206, pages 181 - 185 | - PRAT et al., J. Rehabil. Res. Dev., (20020000), vol. 39, pages 187 - 199 | - HEMMER et al., Nat. Rev. Neurosci., (20020000), vol. 3, pages 291 - 301 | - LUBETZKI et al., Curr. Opin. Neurol., (20050000), vol. 18, pages 237 - 244 | - WOLINSKY et al., Ann Neurol, (20070000), vol. 61, pages 13 - 24 | - CZLONKOWSKA, Med Sci Monit, (20020000), vol. 8, pages RA165 - 77 | - AKIYAMA, Neurobiol Aging., (20000000), vol. 21, pages 383 - 421 | - CENTONZE, Trends Pharm Sci, (20070000), vol. 28, pages 180 - 7 | - ELLIOT, Brain Res Mol Brain Res, (20010000), vol. 95, pages 172 - 8 | - FRIEND et al., Exp. Hematol., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 321 - 328 | - RAY et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19960000), vol. 26, pages 10 - 16 | - CANDEIAS et al., Immunology Letters, (19970000), vol. 57, pages 9 - 14 | - LEVIN, J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 162, pages 677 - 683 | - RECHE et al., J. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 167, pages 336 - 343 | - SOUMELIS et al., Nat. Immunol., (20020000), vol. 3, pages 673 - 680 | - SHAH et al., Clin. Exp. Allergy., (19950000), vol. 25, pages 1038 - 1044 | - MOFFATT, M.F.; COOKSON, W.O., Hum. Mol. Genet., (19970000), vol. 6, pages 551 - 554 | - ITO et al., J. Exp. Med., vol. 202, pages 1213 - 1223 | - YING et al., J. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 174, pages 8183 - 8190 | - PANDEY et al., Nat. Immunol., (20000000), vol. 1, pages 59 - 64 | - ISAKSEN et al., J. Immunol., (20020000), vol. 168, pages 3288 - 3294 | - YOO et al., J. Exp. Med., (20050000), vol. 202, pages 541 - 549 | - ZHOU et al., Nat. Immunol., (20050000), vol. 6, pages 1047 - 1053 | - AL-SHAMI et al., J. Exp. Med., (20050000), vol. 202, pages 829 - 839 | - YONG-JUN et al., J. Exp. Med., (20060000), vol. 203, pages 269 - 273 | - LIYUN SHI et al., Clin. Immunol., (20080000), vol. 129, pages 202 - 210 | - ROCHMAN et al., J. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 178, pages 6720 - 6724 | - OMORI M.; ZIEGLER S., J. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 178, pages 1396 - 1404 | - SUNG et al., J. Immunol., vol. 166, pages 1261 - 1271 | - LAMBRECHT et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20000000), vol. 106, pages 551 - 559 | - BRENNAN F. M., Lancet, (19890000), vol. 2, pages 244 - 7 | - HAWORTH C, Eur. J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 21, pages 2575 - 2579 | - N. M. HOOPER et al., Biochem. J., (19970000), vol. 321, pages 265 - 279 | - SHAPIRO et al., Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19920000), vol. 267, page 4664 | - SHAPIRO et al., Journal of Biological Chemistry, (19930000), vol. 268, page 23824 | - MATSUMOTO et al., Am. J. Pathol., (19980000), vol. 153, page 109 | - ANDERSON; SHINAGAWA, Current Opinion in Anti-inflammatory and Immunomodulatory Investigational Drugs, (19990000), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 29 - 38 | - MATETZKY S; FISHBEIN M C et al., Circulation, (20001031), vol. 102, no. 18, pages 36 - 39 | - S. M. WILHELM et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, no. 29, pages 17213 - 17221 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19900000), vol. 265, no. 36, page 22570 | - T. H. VU; Z. WERB, In: Matrix Metalloproteinases, Academic Press, (19980000), pages 115 - 148 | - MOL. BIOL., Am. J. Resp. Cell, (19970000), vol. 5, pages 583 - 591 | - Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (19980000), vol. 158, pages 1945 - 1950 | - J Allergy Clin Immunol, (19990000), vol. 104, pages 356 - 363 | - SIMPSON et al., "Differential proteolytic enzyme activity in eosinophilic and neutrophilic asthma", Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20050000), vol. 172, pages 559 - 565 | - LEE et al., "A murine model of toluene diisocyanate-induced asthma can be treated with matrix metalloproteinase inhibitor", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20010000), vol. 108, pages 1021 - 1026 | - LEE et al., "Matrix metalloproteinase inhibitor regulates inflammatory cell migration by reducing ICAM-1 and VCAM-1 expression in a murine model of toluene diisocyanate-induced asthma", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (20030000), vol. 111, pages 1278 - 1284 | - BECKETT R. P.; WHITTAKER M., Exp. Opin. Ther. Patents, (19980000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 259 - 282 | - WHITTAKER M. et al., Chemical Reviews, (19990000), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 2735 - 2776 | - BERNARDO, J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 11201 - 11207 | - PROSCH S., Virology, (19950000), vol. 208, pages 197 - 206 | - SMITH J. W., J. Clin. Oncol., (19920000), vol. 10, pages 1141 - 1152 | - CHAPMAN P. B., J. Clin. Oncol., (19870000), vol. 5, pages 1942 - 1951 | - GRONICH J., J. Clin. Invest., (19940000), vol. 93, pages 1224 - 1233 | - LIOU L. B., Clin. Exp. Rheumatol., (20010000), vol. 19, pages 515 - 523 | - SVENUNGSSON E. et al., Ann. Rheum. Dis., (20010000), vol. 60, pages 372 - 9 | - KORHONEN et al., Curr Drug Targets Inflamm Allergy, (20050000), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 471 - 9 | - SHAH et al., Env. Health Persp., vol. 106, no. 5, pages 1139 - 1143 | - AMADEU; COSTA, J. Cutan. Pathol., (20060000), vol. 33, pages 465 - 473 | - AMADEU; COSTA, J. Cutan Pathol, (20060000), vol. 33, pages 465 - 473 | - LININGTON et al., J. Neuroimmunol., (19920000), vol. 40, pages 219 - 224 | - BERGER et al., N. Engl. J. Med., (20030710), vol. 349, no. 2, pages 139 - 45 | - LEE; LEE, Bull. Kor. Chem. Soc. 2003, (20030000), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 802 - 804 | - "Chapter 6,", H. Brian Dunford,, Heme Peroxidases, H. Brian Dunford, Wiley-VCH, (19990000), vol. 6, pages 112 - 123 | - KHAJEHPOUR et al., PROTEINS: Struct, Funct, Genet., (20030000), vol. 53, pages 656 - 666 | - BUNKIN et al., Journal of Experimental and Theoretical Physics, (20070000), vol. 104, pages 486 - 498 | - Banker and Chalmers,, Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J. B. Lippincott Co., (19820000), pages 238 - 250 | - Toissel,, ASHP Handbook on Injectable Drugs, 4th ed.,, (19860000), pages 622 - 630 | - LIU, YJ, "Thymic stromal lymphopoietin: Master switch for allergic inflammation", J Exp Med, (20060000), vol. 203, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20051745, pages 269 - 273, XP002482347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20051745 | - AL-SHAMI et al., "A role for TSLP in the development of inflammation in an asthma model", J Exp Med, (20050000), vol. 202, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20050199, pages 829 - 839, XP002528757 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20050199 | - VIGNOLA et al., "Sputum metalloproteinase-9/tissue inhibitor of metalloproteinase-1 ratio correlates with airflow obstruction in asthma and chronic bronchitis", Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (19980000), vol. 158, pages 1945 - 1950, XP002223183 | - HOSHINO et al., "Inhaled corticosteroids decrease subepithelial collagen deposition by modulation of the balance between matrix metalloproteinase-9 and tissue inhibitor of metalloproteinase-1 expression in asthma", J Allergy Clin Immunol, (19990000), vol. 104, doi:doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70379-9, pages 356 - 363, XP027464703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70379-9 | - ELWOOD et al., J Allergy Clin Immuno, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 951 - 60 | - SIROIS; BISSONNETTE, Clin Exp Immunol, (20010000), vol. 126, pages 9 - 15 | - DOLORES M CONROY; TIMOTHY J WILLIAMS, Respiratory Research, (20010000), vol. 2, pages 150 - 156 | - "New Way Chemistry for Hong Kong A-Level", Y.C. WONG; C.T. WONG, Or Standard Methods for the Examination of Water and Wastewater, vol. 4, page 248 | - AL SHAMI et al., J. Exp. Med., (20040000), pages 159 - 168 | - HUSTON et al., Curr. Allergy Asthma Rep., (20060000), vol. 6, pages 372 - 376 | - KOYAMA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20070000), vol. 357, pages 99 - 104 | - GREGORY et al., Nature Genetics, (20070729), vol. 39, pages 1083 - 1091 | - AVOLIO et al., J Neurolmmunol, (20030000), vol. 1, no. 36, pages 46 - 53 |