EP2272191 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CANDIDATE LIST GENERATION FOR UPLINK V-MIMO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATRAMAN, Shankar 16500 Lauder Lane Apt. 18203 Dallas, TX 75248 / US | 02 /
CHEEDA, Ashvin 2520 Geiberg Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 03 /
DEANE, Peter, Michael 4779 Newtown Road Fitzroy Harbour, Ontario K0A 1X0 / CA | 04 /
CHEONG, Patrick, Lie, Chin 45 Stikine Drive Kanata, Ontario K2T 1H5 / CA | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Boyce, Conor FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09739544.6 | 28.04.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009US41893 | Priority number, date | US20080048369P | 28.04.2008 Original published format: US 48369 P | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009134742 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272191 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B7/02 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04B7/0452 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B7/024 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR);
H04W72/04 (BR,KR,US);
H04B7/0854 (KR);
H04J11/005 (EP,BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/02] | H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON KANDIDATENLISTEN FÜR EIN UPLINK-V-MIMO-SYSTEM | [2011/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CANDIDATE LIST GENERATION FOR UPLINK V-MIMO | [2011/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE LISTES DE CANDIDATS POUR UN MIMO VIRTUEL DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2020/10] |
Former [2011/02] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE LISTE DE CANDIDATS POUR UN MIMO VIRTUEL DE LIAISON MONTANTE | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 30.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007171808 (WU JIANMING [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,14 * figures 10B,11A,11B * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * [I] 1-15; | [A] - QIAN Y ET AL, "Group-based user pairing for virtual MIMO in LTE", JOURNAL OF CHINA UNIVERSITIES OF POSTS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS, XX, CN, vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1005-8885(07)60146-0, ISSN 1005-8885, (20070901), pages 38 - 42, (20070901), XP022938022 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1005-8885(07)60146-0 | [A] - MOTOROLA, "EUTRA Uplink System Design Options", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-062661_ULDESIGN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061006), vol. RAN WG1, no. Seoul, Korea; 20061006, XP050103155 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - HEDAYAT A ET AL, "Cooperative communication in wireless networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20041001), vol. 42, no. 10, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2004.1341264, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 74 - 80, XP011120045 [A] 1-15 * figure 6 * * page 77 - page 80 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2004.1341264 | International search | [X]US2007171808 (WU JIANMING [CA], et al); | [Y]US2007285315 (DAVIS DENNIS W [US], et al); | [Y]US2008084848 (JARD ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) | Examination | - Anonymous, "Throughput", (20080427), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Throughput&oldid=208518121, (20181005), XP055512991 | - ERICSSON, "E-UTRA Downlink User Throughput and Spectrum Efficiency Evaluation with Beamforming", vol. RAN WG1, no. Cannes, France; 20060627 - 20060630, (20060620), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-061865, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_0606/Docs/, (20060620), XP050951272 | - OFUJI Y ET AL, "Comparison of packet scheduling algorithms focusing on user throughput in high speed downlink packet access", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2002. THE 13TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEPT. 15-18, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020915), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-7589-5, pages 1462 - 1466, XP010611506 | by applicant | US2007171808 |