EP2280675 - APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING BRAIN DAMAGE DURING CARDIAC ARREST, CPR, OR SEVERE SHOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/06] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING BRAIN DAMAGE DURING CARDIAC ARREST, CPR, OR SEVERE SHOCK | ||
[2013/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brader, Eric William 2604 Hunters Point Court Wexford, PA 15090 / US | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states Brader, Eric William 2604 Hunters Point Court Wexford, PA 15090 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Wheatley, Alison Clare Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/09] | Wheatley, Alison Clare Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2011/06] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street GB-Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739856.4 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009US42391 | Priority number, date | US20080049203P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 49203 P | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135054 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280675 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280675 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/00 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
A61F7/10 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0002 (EP,US);
A61F7/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON HIRNSCHÄDEN BEI HERZSTILLSTAND, HLW ODER SCHWEREM SCHOCK | [2013/43] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PREVENTING BRAIN DAMAGE DURING CARDIAC ARREST, CPR, OR SEVERE SHOCK | [2013/43] | French: | APPAREIL POUR EMPÊCHER LES DOMMAGES AU CERVEAU PENDANT UN ARRÊT CARDIAQUE, UNE CPR OU UN CHOC SÉVÈRE | [2013/43] |
Former [2011/06] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON HIRNSCHÄDEN BEI HERZSTILLSTAND, HLW ODER SCHWEREM SCHOCK | ||
Former [2011/06] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING BRAIN DAMAGE DURING CARDIAC ARREST, CPR, OR SEVERE SHOCK | ||
Former [2011/06] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EMPÊCHER LES DOMMAGES AU CERVEAU PENDANT UN ARRÊT CARDIAQUE, UNE CPR OU UN CHOC SÉVÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 18.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2009 | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | FR | 23.06.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MK | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.04.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FR | 23.06.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4920963 (BRADER ERIC W [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-14 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,7,15; | [X]DE102006031944 (SIEGLER JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]US4026299 (SAUDER JAMES W) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 57 *; | [Y]US6277143 (KLATZ RONALD M [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * column 13, line 1 - line 7 *; | [A]WO0104548 (TDA RESEARCH INC [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * abstract * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 7 * * page 28, line 8 - line 22 *; | [Y]US7040115 (LOPEZ JESSE M [US], et al) [Y] 15 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - line 43 * | International search | [Y]US4920963 (BRADER ERIC W [US]); | [Y]US6277143 (KLATZ RONALD M [US], et al); | [Y]US4304070 (MUSACCHIA JOHN); | [Y]US5755756 (FREEDMAN JR ROBERT J [US], et al) |