EP2310077 - TECHNIQUES FOR PLACING MEDICAL LEADS FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION OF NERVE TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNES, John, E. 12823 Bluebird Street NW Coon Rapids MN 55448 / US | 02 /
GARDESKI, Kenneth, C. 10405 45th Avenue North Plymouth MN 55442 / US | 03 /
KLEPFER, Ruth, N. 3707 Grand Way 414 St. Louis Park MN 55416 / US | 04 /
MACAULAY, Patrick, E. 127 Meadow Drive Windsor CA 95492 / US | 05 /
MORRIS, Mary, M. 542 Elaine Avenue Shoreview MN 55126 / US | 06 /
SCHEINER, Avram 4403 Meadowood Circle Vadnais Heights MN 55127 / US | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09739885.3 | 30.04.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009US42439 | Priority number, date | US20080007543P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 7543 P | US20080190045P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 190045 P | US20080190046P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 190046 P | US20080007542P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 7542 P | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135083 | Date: | 05.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2310077 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61B17/34, A61N1/05, A61M25/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
A61N1/36053 (US);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61N1/05 (US);
A61N1/0551 (US);
A61N1/36085 (US);
A61N1/36114 (US);
A61N1/36125 (US);
A61N1/36128 (US);
A61N1/057 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR PLATZIERUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN LEITUNGEN ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN STIMULATION VON NERVENGEWEBE | [2011/16] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR PLACING MEDICAL LEADS FOR ELECTRICAL STIMULATION OF NERVE TISSUE | [2011/16] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE PLACEMENT DE DÉRIVATIONS MÉDICALES POUR LA STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN TISSU NERVEUX | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004015193 (LAMSON THEODORE C [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0028] - [0032] - [0037] , [0038] , [0040] - [0042] - [0044] , [0045]; figures 1a-8 *; | [A]US2004039371 (TOCKMAN BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0054] - [0065]; figures 7A-14 *; | [A]US2005010237 (NIAZI IMRAN K [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0007] - [0012] *; | [A]US2006247750 (SEIFERT KEVIN R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0033] , [0039] , [0047] - [0049] - [0066] , [0070]; figures 2,3,6,9,10 * | by applicant | US2004015193 |