EP2349804 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR USING ADAPTED HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE (HMI) ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÄHLIN, Ulrich Lübecker Straße 4 65670 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
GEE, Robert 28358 Vance Court Lake Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Bonn, Roman Klemens, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Bonn, Roman Klemens, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09740132.7 | 22.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009EP63927 | Priority number, date | DE20081043077 | 22.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008043077 | [2011/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010046453 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349804 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349804 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/08, B60R11/02, B60R25/00, G01C11/02, G01C21/26, G01C21/36 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
B60W50/08 (EP);
G01C21/265 (EP);
G01C21/3626 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | B60W50/08, B60R11/02, B60R25/00, G01C11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZ ZUR VERWENDUNG ANGEPASSTER MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLE (MMS) ELEMENTE | [2011/31] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR USING ADAPTED HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE (HMI) ELEMENTS | [2011/31] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA CONDUITE DESTINÉ À UTILISER DES ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE (IHM) ADAPTÉS | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 16.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | ES | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | IT | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | NL | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | TR | 13.08.2014 | AT | 22.10.2014 | IE | 22.10.2014 | LU | 22.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | GB | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
GB | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
IE | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
IT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
NL | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
ES | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008079891 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [X] 1,4-5,14-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0040] - [0046] - [0 54] , [0 57] , [0 64] , [0 65] , [0073] , [0 74] , [0077] , [0 90] , [0113]; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-3,6-13; | [A]EP1568555 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0225] - [0229]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2007143798 (JIRA JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1145909 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0037]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO2008079891 |