EP2356866 - PAGING PERIODS IN A MOBILE DEVICE SYNCHRONISED WITH MULTIPLE BASE STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIN, Tom 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LEE, Kuo-Chun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09740813.2 | 16.10.2009 | [2011/33] | WO2009US61099 | Priority number, date | US20080260354 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: US 260354 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010053676 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2356866 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2356866 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00, H04W76/04 | [2011/33] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0225 (KR);
H04W56/001 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/33] | Title | German: | PAGING-PERIODEN IN EINER MIT MEHREREN BASISSTATIONEN SYNCHRONISIERTEN MOBILEN EINRICHTUNG | [2011/33] | English: | PAGING PERIODS IN A MOBILE DEVICE SYNCHRONISED WITH MULTIPLE BASE STATIONS | [2011/33] | French: | PÉRIODES DE PAGING DANS UN APPAREIL MOBILE SYNCHRONISÉ AVEC PLUSIEURS STATIONS DE BASE | [2012/10] |
Former [2011/33] | PÉRIODES D'APPEL DE RADIOMESSAGERIE DANS UN APPAREIL MOBILE SYNCHRONISÉ AVEC PLUSIEURS STATIONS DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/33] | 27.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2009 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | IE | 16.10.2012 | LU | 16.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | FR | 19.11.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 16.10.2009 | |
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
LU | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
LU | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 19.11.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0207459 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-13,15-20,22-27 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 32 * * page 8, line 9 - page 10, line 28 * * page 13, line 11 - page 15, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2005048982 (ROLAND RICK [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15-20,22-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - paragraphs [0059] , [0060] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [A]WO2006011775 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-28* page 11, line 1 - page 18, line 4 * |