EP2351275 - Method and apparatus for interference reporting in a N-MIMO communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/31] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERFERENCE REPORTING IN A N-MIMO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
[2014/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALANKI, Ravi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei Y. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2011/31] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1 DE-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09740827.2 | 22.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US61723 | Priority number, date | US20080108278P | 24.10.2008 Original published format: US 108278 P | US20090162613P | 23.03.2009 Original published format: US 162613 P | US20090580139 | 15.10.2009 Original published format: US 580139 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010048437 | Date: | 29.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2351275 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351275 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04L1/00, H04L1/02, H04W72/08, H04L5/00, H04W24/00, H04J11/00, // H04W72/04 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H04L1/0028 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B17/24 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B17/345 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (US);
H04J11/0053 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/02 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04W72/27 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,BR,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | H04L1/00, H04B7/06, H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR INTERFERENZMELDUNG IN EINEM N-MIMO KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for interference reporting in a N-MIMO communication system | [2014/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL CONÇUS POUR RAPPORTER L'INTERFÉRENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MIMO DE RÉSEAU | [2015/16] |
Former [2011/31] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STÖRUNGSMELDUNG IN EINEM N-MIMO-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2011/31] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERFERENCE REPORTING IN A N-MIMO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2011/31] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL CONÇUS POUR RAPPORTER L'INTERFÉRENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MIMO DE RÉSEAU | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 31.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15165367.2 / EP2938016 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2009 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | IE | 22.10.2015 | LU | 22.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 22.10.2009 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.10.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.10.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.10.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.10.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004166886 (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al); | [XI]US2005163194 (GORE DHANANJAY A [US], et al) |