EP2334477 - PACKAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondelez UK Holdings & Services Limited Cadbury House Sanderson Road Uxbridge, Middlesex UB8 1DH / GB | [2014/03] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Cadbury Holdings Limited Cadbury House Sanderson Road Uxbridge, Middlesex UB8 1DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLEY, Jason 6 Boon Close Barry CF63 1RG / GB | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Wilson Gunn 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham, West Midlands B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09740922.1 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009GB02335 | Priority number, date | GB20080018312 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: GB 0818312 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010040984 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2334477 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2334477 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B26F1/38, B65B61/16, B65B9/20 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B26F1/384 (EP,US);
B65B61/16 (EP,US);
B65B61/005 (EP,US);
B65B9/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | B26F1/38, B65B61/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2011/25] | English: | PACKAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2011/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'EMBALLAGE | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 02.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2009 | AT | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | IE | 01.10.2014 | LU | 01.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2130133 (LINNEBORN KG A) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y]GB2273287 (SMURFIT PACKAGING PRODUCTS [GB]) [Y] 18-20 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 12; figure - *; | [Y]US6574942 (HEIMANN HORST [DE], et al) [Y] 7,10 * column 2, lines 23-39; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2003179957 (TANKERSLEY JAMES I [US]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figures 1,2,6a-6c *; | [XY]EP1588950 (TMC SPA [IT]) [X] 1-6,8-9,11-12,14-17,21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025]; figure - * [Y] 7,10,13,18-20 | Examination | GB1260760 | US4566252 | US2006144021 | US3924383 |