EP2277032 - A MOLECULE DETECTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liu, Zhiping Building Four Room 1302 Courtyard One Yazi Bridge Road Xuanwu District Beijing 100055 / CN | For all designated states Luan, Sheng 451 Koshland Hall Berkeley, California 94720 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09741663.0 | 11.05.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009CN00507 | Priority number, date | US20080126929 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 126929 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135388 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2277032 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/76, C12Q1/68, G01N33/543, B01J19/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00641 (EP,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2565/518, C12Q2565/507 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/04] | G01N21/76, C12Q1/68, G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON MOLEKÜLEN | [2011/04] | English: | A MOLECULE DETECTING SYSTEM | [2011/04] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE MOLECULES | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004043508 (FRUTOS ANTHONY G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * examples 1,2 * * figure 1B *; | [X]WO9828444 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,15 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 17 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 2 * * page 15, line 6 - line 27 * * examples 1,5,6 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US5552270 (KHRAPKO KONSTANTIN R [RU], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,15 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 64 * * example 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US2003082294 (BRUHN LAURAKAY [US], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] * * claims 1-26 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 10; | [Y]WO2007022474 (CYLENE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0062] *; | [Y]US2007048747 (LESLIE THOMAS M [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US2005048570 (WEBER ACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004115685 (TERCERO JUAN CARLOS [ES], et al); | [Y]US6242246 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al); | [X]CN200989904Y (SHANGHAI MICRO SYSTEM AND INFO [CN]); | [Y]US2003059809 (VUJASINOVIC TODOR [FR], et al); | [Y]CN1876840 (UNIV SOUTHEAST [CN]); | [XP]CN101241124 (BOAO BIOTECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1483083 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US5948621 (TURNER DAVID C [US], et al); | [A]JPH10267841 (KOKURITSU SHINTAI SHOGAISHA RE); | [A]WO9953320 (UNIV UTAH STATE [US]) | [X] - SONG, B. ET AL., "Optical immuno-sensors chip for environmental monitoring and food security detection", J. TSINGHUS UNIV (SCI&TECH), (2007), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 847 - 850, XP008147966 | [Y] - VICTOR S.-Y.LIN ET AL., "A porous silicon-based optical interferometric biosensor", SCIENCE, (199710), vol. 278, no. 31, pages 840 - 843, XP002920674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.278.5339.840 | [Y] - MANSSUR YALPANI ET AL., "Selective chemical modifications of dextran", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1985), vol. 23, pages 1395 - 1405, XP008145131 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1985.170230513 | [X] - CUI, X. ET AL., "Detection of anti-human serum albumin antibody using surface Plasmon resonance biosensor", CHINESE JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (200008), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 950 - 955 |