20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
20.01.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
28.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
12.02.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
20.01.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
17.07.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
26.06.2015 |
Change - inventor |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.01.2013 |
First examination report |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
27.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
10.12.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] |
22.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|