EP2271576 - LATERALLY BRACED LATTICE MAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terex Cranes Germany GmbH Dinglerstrasse 24 66482 Zweibrücken / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Terex Demag GmbH Dinglerstrasse 24 66482 Zweibrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARP, Günter 1000 Mango Ct. Wilmington, NC 28409 / US | 02 /
KÖSTER, Fritz-Botho Waldstrasse 15 67806 Rockenhausen / DE | 03 /
SCHNITTKER, Frank Voglerstrasse 2 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
KARP, Günter Am Feld 22a 66919 Herschberg / DE | ||
02 /
KÖSTER, Fritz-Botho Waldstrasse 15 67806 Rockenhausen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNITTKER, Frank Voglerstrasse 2 97074 Würzburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
KARP, Günter Am Feld 22a 66919 Herschberg / DE | ||
02 /
KÖSTER, Fritz-Botho Waldstrasse 15 67806 Rockenhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2011/02] | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09741881.8 | 06.05.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009EP03238 | Priority number, date | DE20082006167U | 06.05.2008 Original published format: DE 202008006167 U | [2011/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009135662 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271576 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271576 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/82 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B66C23/825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2011/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SEITLICH ABGESPANNTER GITTERMAST | [2011/02] | English: | LATERALLY BRACED LATTICE MAST | [2011/02] | French: | MÂT EN TREILLIS ENTRETOISÉ LATÉRALEMENT | [2011/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 25.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15178247.1 / EP2998264 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2009 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | IE | 06.05.2016 | LU | 06.05.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | GB | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
GB | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE202004009782U (LIEBHERR WERK EHINGEN [DE]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10022600 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]DE10128986 (DEMAG MOBILE CRANES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0165166 | EP1213254 | DE202004009782U | DE19991030537 |