EP2279207 - HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN INTERFERON-ALPHA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argos Therapeutics, Inc. 4233 Technology Drive Durham, NC 27704 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVENSSON, Lars Anders Roskildevägen 17B 217 46 Malmö / SE | 02 /
PADKJÆR, Søren Rosen Allé 2 Hareskov 3500 Værløse / DK | 03 /
FRIEDRICHSEN, Birgitte Agertoften 12 2800 Gentofte / DK | 04 /
OLSEN KROGH, Berit Vamdrupvej 57 2610 Rødovre / DK | 05 /
LUND PEDERSEN, Inger Vangsåvej 10 2720 Vanløse / DK | 06 /
FLECKNER, Jan c/o Novo Nordisk a/s Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
SVENSSON, Lars Anders Roskildevägen 17B S-217 46 Malmö / SE | ||
02 /
PADKJÆR, Søren Rosen Allé 2 Hareskov DK-3500 Værløse / DK | |||
03 /
FRIEDRICHSEN, Birgitte Agertoften 12 DK-2800 Gentofte / DK | |||
04 /
OLSEN KROGH, Berit Vamdrupvej 57 DK-2610 Rødovre / DK | |||
05 /
LUND PEDERSEN, Inger Vangsåvej 10 DK-2720 Vanløse / DK | |||
06 /
FLECKNER, Jan c/o Novo Nordisk a/s Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2011/05] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09742079.8 | 06.05.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009EP55448 | Priority number, date | EP20080103847 | 07.05.2008 Original published format: EP 08103847 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009135861 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2279207 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2279207 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, C07K16/46 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
C07K16/249 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2011/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HUMANISIERTE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN MENSCHLICHES INTERFERON-ALPHA | [2011/05] | English: | HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST HUMAN INTERFERON-ALPHA | [2011/05] | French: | ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS CONTRE L'INTERFÉRON-ALPHA HUMAIN | [2011/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 27.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2009 | AT | 09.09.2015 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | HR | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | MK | 09.09.2015 | NL | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SE | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | NO | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | IE | 06.05.2016 | LU | 06.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.05.2009 | |
AT | 09.09.2015 | ||
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
MK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.05.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NL | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
HR | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
SE | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 09.09.2015 | |
NO | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02066649 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005059106 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006086586 (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008021976 (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHUNTHARAPAI ANAN ET AL, "Characterization and humanization of a monoclonal antibody that neutralizes human leukocyte interferon: A candidate therapeutic for IDDM and SLE", CYTOKINE, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20010907), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 250 - 260, XP002307361 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - LAZAR GREG A ET AL, "A molecular immunology approach to antibody humanization and functional optimization.", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY MAR 2007, (200703), vol. 44, no. 8, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 1986 - 1998, XP002540093 [A] 1-13 * page 1993, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2006.09.029 | [A] - WU H ET AL, "Humanization of a murine monoclonal antibody by simultaneous optimization of framework and CDR residues.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY 19 NOV 1999, (19991119), vol. 294, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 151 - 162, XP002540094 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3141 | [A] - KASHMIRI SYED V S ET AL, "SDR grafting--a new approach to antibody humanization.", METHODS (SAN DIEGO, CALIF.) MAY 2005, (200505), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 25 - 34, XP002540095 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.YMETH.2005.01.003 |