EP2268671 - NOVEL ANTIBODIES USED TO TREAT CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Médicament 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pierre Fabre Medicament 45, Place Abel Gance 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEUW, Jean-François 30 Domaine du Salève Route du Salève F-74160 Beaumont / FR | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/01] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09742268.7 | 08.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009FR50612 | Priority number, date | FR20080001985 | 11.04.2008 Original published format: FR 0801985 | [2011/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009136070 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268671 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | RS | 04.11.2010 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ANTIKÖRPER ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2011/01] | English: | NOVEL ANTIBODIES USED TO TREAT CANCER | [2011/01] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANTICORPS UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2011/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 28.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9966027 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - TESTA J E ET AL, "EUKARYOTIC EXPRESSION CLONING WITH AN ANTIMETASTATIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY IDENTIFIES A TETRASPANIN (PETA-3/CD151) AS AN EFFECTOR OF HUMAN TUMOR CELL MIGRATION AND METASTASIS", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, (19990801), vol. 59, no. 15, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3812 - 3820, XP008064694 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - GEARY S M ET AL, "Differential tissue expression of epitopes of the tetraspanin CD151 recognised by monoclonal antibodies", TISSUE ANTIGENS, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (20010901), vol. 58, no. 3, ISSN 0001-2815, pages 141 - 153, XP002435970 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-0039.2001.580301.x | [A] - SERRU V ET AL, "Selective tetraspan-integrin complexes (CD81/alpha4beta1, CD151/alpha3beta1, CD151/alpha6beta1) under conditions disrupting tetraspan interactions", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, THE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, (19990515), vol. 340, no. PART 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 103 - 111, XP002435969 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3400103 |