EP2288401 - DOSE COUNTER AND LOCKOUT MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Map Pharmaceuticals Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | [2015/16] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states MAP Pharmaceuticals Inc 2400 Bayshore Parkway, Suite 200 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIANTO, Alfred 230 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09743076.3 | 07.05.2009 | [2011/09] | WO2009US02860 | Priority number, date | US20080126855P | 07.05.2008 Original published format: US 126855 P | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009137089 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2288401 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2288401 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A61M15/0081 (EP,US);
A61M15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M15/0076 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
A61M15/0091 (EP,US);
A61M15/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2011/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DOSISZÄHLER UND SPERRMECHANISMUS | [2011/09] | English: | DOSE COUNTER AND LOCKOUT MECHANISM | [2011/09] | French: | COMPTEUR DE DOSES ET MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE | [2011/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 26.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0414536 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002078950 (O'LEARY DAVID [GB]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002100472 (CASPER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1616592 (SOFOTEC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US2006231093 (BURGE SIMON [GB], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0068] - [0 93] - [0098] - [ 102] - [0104] - [ 111] - [0114] *; | [A]US2006283444 (JONES MATTHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007062518 (GESER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0068] * | International search | [A]US2002078950 (O'LEARY DAVID [GB]); | [X]US2006231093 (BURGE SIMON [GB], et al); | [Y]US2007062518 (GESER JOHANNES [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2006231093 | US2007062518 |