EP2273974 - PROGUANIL TO TREAT SKIN/MUCOSAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tolmar, Inc. 701 Centre Avenue Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODOWSKI, Kenneth 2213 Grosvenor Court Fort Collins CO 80526 / US | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Danner, Stefan, et al LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elsenheimerstrasse 47a 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Danner, Stefan, et al LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Sankt-Martin-Strasse 53-55 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | Danner, Stefan, et al DR. VOLKER VOSSIUS Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | Danner, Stefan, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 DE-80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09743087.0 | 08.05.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US02879 | Priority number, date | US20080051812 | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 51812 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009137100 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2273974 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/155, A61P17/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61K9/122 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | PROGUANIL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUT-/SCHLEIMHAUTERKRANKUNGEN | [2011/03] | English: | PROGUANIL TO TREAT SKIN/MUCOSAL DISEASES | [2011/03] | French: | PROGUANIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES MALADIES DE PEAU/DES MUQUEUSES | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2320735 (DABIS GEORGES [FR]) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008005276 (DIRECTCONTACT LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006053160 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - SEAL DAVID, "Treatment of Acanthamoeba keratitis", EXPERT REVIEW OF ANTI-INFECTIVE THERAPY, FUTURE DRUGS, (20030801), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1478-7210, pages 205 - 208, XP008093290 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14787210.1.2.205 | [A] - HORACEK J, "Absorption spectrum of antimalarials related to their clinical efficiency in the treatment of discoid lupus erythematosus", CESKOSLOVENSKA DERMATOLOGIE, CESKA LEKARSKA SPOLECNOST J.E. PURKYNE, PRAGUE, CZ, (19590101), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0009-0514, pages 39 - 44, XP008121915 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20010422), Database accession no. 51:57294, URL: stn, XP002581322 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - V. VILLARI ET AL., "Antibacterial action in vitro of paludrine combined with aureomycin and with chloramphenicol", RIV. IST. SIEROTERAP. ITAL., (1957), vol. 32, pages 44 - 46 [A] 1-24 | [A] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20010422), Database accession no. 45:41845, URL: stn, XP002581323 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [ ] - M. SIRSI ET AL., "In vitro study of acridine biguanide derivatives upon some pathogenic microorganisms", CURRENT SCIENCE, (1950), vol. 19, pages 293 - 294 | [A] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20010422), Database accession no. 52:106827, URL: STN, XP002581324 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [ ] - T. CHRUSCIEL ET AL., "Pharmacological properties of the biologically active metabolite of paludrine and its bromo and iodo derivatives", DISSERTATIONES PHARMACEUTICAE, (1958), vol. 10, pages 81 - 91 | Examination | US2006269485 |