EP2291460 - SURFACE-MODIFIED NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Neeraj 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
VU, Choua, C. 2633 Brittany Lane Woodury, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09743578.8 | 06.05.2009 | [2011/10] | WO2009US43003 | Priority number, date | US20080051468P | 08.05.2008 Original published format: US 51468 P | US20080051477P | 08.05.2008 Original published format: US 51477 P | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009137592 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2291460 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/02, C09C3/12, A61K9/00 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/0075 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/02 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTE NANOPARTIKEL | [2011/10] | English: | SURFACE-MODIFIED NANOPARTICLES | [2011/10] | French: | NANOPARTICULES MODIFIÉES EN SURFACE | [2011/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/10] | 21.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004241101 (BARAN JIMMIE R [US], et al) [X] 1-21,23-26 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [0017] , [0033] - [0043] - [0 53] - [0060] - [0 66] - [0067] - [0087] * [I] 22; | [XI]US2004242729 (BARAN JIMMIE R [US], et al) [X] 1-13,18,20-23 * paragraphs [0008] - [0023] - [0034] , [0039] - [0050] * [I] 22; | [XA]WO2008033718 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-15,18 * page 5, line 12 - page 12, line 20 * [A] 19-24; | [A] - ROETHER J A ET AL, "The effect of surface treatment of hydroxyapatite on the properties of a bioactive bone cement", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20040401), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 413 - 418, XP019212037 [A] 1-26 * "introduction", "materials and methods, paragraph 2.2" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:JMSM.0000021112.51065.40 | [A] - A.M.P. DUPRAZ ET AL., "Characterization of silane-treated hydroxyapatite powders for use as filler in biodegradable composites", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 30, XP002564025 [A] 1-26 * "materials and methods" * |