Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
28.01.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.06.2012 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.08.2011 | Change - representative | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
08.07.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
20.05.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
16.05.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.12.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
17.12.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
13.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.11.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.11.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |