EP2273916 - MULTIMODAL CATHETER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTRAVASCULAR ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InfraReDx, Inc. 34 Third Avenue Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, James, E. 29 Studio Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | 02 /
WILDER, Mark, A. 136 Goden Street Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
MULLER, James, E. 29 Studio Road Auburndale, MA 02466 / US | ||
02 /
WILDER, Mark, A. 10 Lantern Lane Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/03] | Fiorani, Giuseppe, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09743645.5 | 07.05.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US43119 | Priority number, date | US20080051227P | 07.05.2008 Original published format: US 51227 P | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009137659 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273916 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B8/12 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/0062 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (EP,US);
A61B5/0086 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/03] | Title | German: | MEHRMODUS-KATHETERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTRAVASKULÄRE ANALYSEN | [2011/03] | English: | MULTIMODAL CATHETER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTRAVASCULAR ANALYSIS | [2011/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CATHÉTER MULTIMODAL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ANALYSE INTRA-VASCULAIRE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 26.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9732182 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11,13,14 * page 7, line 4 - line 26 * * page 11, line 1 - line 13 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 5 * * page 13, line 20 - line 28 * * page 15, line 15 - line 23 * * page 16, line 14 - line 17 * * page 17, line 8 - line 15 * * page 22, line 29 - page 23, line 2; figures 6,10 * [Y] 3,6,10,12; | [Y]US2006132790 (GUTIN MIKHAIL [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0183] *; | [Y]US2005075574 (FURNISH SIMON [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2007066890 (MASCHKE MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 10,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0032] *; | [YA]US2007135887 (MASCHKE MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0011] , [0065] , [0069]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-14; | [YA]WO2007123518 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 1 * page 21, line 5 - line 24 * [A] 2-14; | [A]WO03057040 (VOLCANO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008097223 (STRICKLER PETER [US], et al) [A] 1,11-13 * the whole document * |