EP2350127 - ISOLATION AND PURIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES USING PROTEIN A AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKMAN, Robert, K. 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Qing 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 03 /
WEED, Cheryl, L. 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 04 /
ENNIS, Scott, T. 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 05 /
PERILLI-PALMER, Barbara 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 06 /
WAN, Min 100 Research Drive Worcester, MA 01605 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09744006.9 | 20.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US61329 | Priority number, date | US20080196753P | 20.10.2008 Original published format: US 196753 P | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010141039 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350127 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350127 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C07K16/24 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/241 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K1/165 (US);
C07K1/18 (US);
C07K1/20 (US);
C07K1/22 (US);
C07K1/36 (US);
C07K16/244 (US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/22 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | RS | 10.05.2011 | Title | German: | ISOLATION UND AUFREINIGUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN DURCH PROTEIN-A-AFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2014/36] | English: | ISOLATION AND PURIFICATION OF ANTIBODIES USING PROTEIN A AFFINITY CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2011/31] | French: | ISOLEMENT ET PURIFICATION D'ANTICORPS PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'AFFINITÉ DE LA PROTÉINE A | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/31] | ISOLATION UND AUFREINIGUNG VON ANTIKANTIKÖRPERN DURCH PROTEIN-A-AFFINITÄTSCHROMATOGRAPHIE | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15152668.8 / EP2921501 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Pharmaceutical Works POLPHARMA Pelplinska Str. 19 83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL Opponent's representative Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | [2015/49] | 12.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.07.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 22.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2009 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | IE | 20.10.2015 | LU | 20.10.2015 | MT | 20.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/22] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PT | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
MT | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2020/21] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
MT | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
MT | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 20.10.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
IE | 20.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
NO | 28.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008079280 (MILLIPORE CORP [US], et al) [X] 27-29 * page 15, first full §;; examples 1,2 *[Y] 1-26; | [XY] - ISHIHARA ET AL, "Accelerated purification process development of monoclonal antibodies for shortening time to clinic", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2007.10.104, (20071107), vol. 1176, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 149 - 156, XP022373481 [X] 27-29 * figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2007.10.104 | [XY] - BRORSON KURT ET AL, "Bracketed generic inactivation of rodent retroviruses by low pH treatment for monoclonal antibodies and recombinant proteins.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 5 MAY 2003, (20030505), vol. 82, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 321 - 329, XP002576168 [X] 27-29 * see results § * [Y] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10574 | Examination | WO9817786 | by applicant | WO9522389 | WO9817786 | WO2008007280 | - ISHIHARA ET AL., Journal of Chromatography, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (2007), vol. 1176 | - BRORSON ET AL., BIOTECLMOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20030505), vol. 82, no. 3 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - POLJAK, R. J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123 | - KIPRIYANOV, S. M. ET AL., HUMAN ANTIBODIES AND HYBRIDOMAS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 93 - 101 | - KIPRIYANOV, S. M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 31, pages 1047 - 1058 | - WINDHAGEN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 182, pages 1985 - 1996 | - MORITA ET AL., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 306 - 314 | - BUCHT ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 103, pages 347 - 367 | - FAIS ET AL., J.INTERFERON RES., (1994), vol. 14, pages 235 - 238 | - PYRRONCHI ET AL., AM. J. PATH., (1997), vol. 150, pages 823 - 832 | - MONTELEONE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1997), vol. 112, pages 1169 - 1178 | - BERREBI ET AL., AM. J. PATH, (1998), vol. 152, pages 667 - 672 | - PYRRONCHI ET AL., ANI. J. PATH., (1997), vol. 150, pages 823 - 832 |