EP2349396 - AUTOMATICALLY SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZING UNIT OF A MEDICAL INJECTION DEVICE WITH FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACIST Medical Systems, Inc. 7905 Fuller Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Acist Medical Systems, Inc. 7905 Fuller Road Eden Prairie, MN 55334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAJICEK, David 14824 Glendale Rd. Minnetonka MN 55345 / US | 02 /
OFTEDAHL, Richard 22806 Drexel Ave. Jordan MN 55352 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09744569.6 | 28.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US62384 | Priority number, date | US20080261713 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: US 261713 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010056528 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2349396 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2349396 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/145, A61M5/168, A61M5/142 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/007 (EP,US);
A61M5/145 (KR);
A61M5/36 (US);
A61K49/04 (KR);
A61M39/22 (KR);
A61M5/00 (US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | A61M5/00, A61M5/145 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ZUFUHR EINER DRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGENDEN EINHEIT EINES MEDIZINISCHEN INJEKTIONSGERÄTS MIT FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2011/31] | English: | AUTOMATICALLY SUPPLYING A PRESSURIZING UNIT OF A MEDICAL INJECTION DEVICE WITH FLUID | [2011/31] | French: | APPORT AUTOMATIQUE DE FLUIDE A UNE UNITE DE MISE EN PRESSION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION MEDICAL | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/31] | APPORT AUTOMATIQUE DE FLUIDE À UNE UNITÉ DE MISE EN PRESSION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION MEDICAL | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2009 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MK | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | SM | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 28.10.2009 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
SM | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
SM | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CZ | 03.10.2012 | |
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CZ | 03.10.2012 | |
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 03.10.2012 | |
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 03.10.2012 | |
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007100282 (SMALL JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 12-14* paragraphs [0009] , [0038] , [0061]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]EP1847284 (ACIST MEDICAL SYS INC [US]) [X] 1-11,19 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0090]; figures 1,7 * [Y] 12-14 [I] 15-18 | by applicant | EP1847284 |