EP2352512 - MECHANISM OF NEUROMEDIN U ACTION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSH, Donald, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
PEIER, Andrea, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
POCAI, Alessandro 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09744577.9 | 30.10.2009 | [2011/32] | WO2009US62660 | Priority number, date | US20080198337P | 05.11.2008 Original published format: US 198337 P | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010053830 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2352512 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, G01N33/74 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
G01N33/566 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/425, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/22, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | WIRKUNGSMECHANISMUS VON NEUROMEDIN U UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2011/32] | English: | MECHANISM OF NEUROMEDIN U ACTION AND USES THEREOF | [2011/32] | French: | MÉCANISME D ACTION DE LA NEUROMÉDINE U ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 20.02.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]WO2007109135 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [XD] 12-20 * page 2 - page 10; example 5; claims 1-35 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]WO03057235 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1 - page 4; examples 6-9 *; | [YD] - HOLST JJ ET AL, "Glucagon-like peptide-1, glucose homeostasis and diabetes", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20080318), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 161 - 168, XP002564847 [YD] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2008.01.003 | [A] - LI X ET AL, "Functional characterization of cell lines for high-throughput screening of human neuromedin U receptor subtype 2 specific agonists using a luciferase reporter gene assay", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, (20070123), vol. 67, pages 284 - 292, XP002564848 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 290 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.01.004 | [A] - BRIGHTON P J ET AL, "Neuromedin U and Its Receptors: Structure, Function, and Physiological Roles", PHARMACOLOGICAL REVIEWS, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS INC., BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20040101), vol. 56, no. 2, ISSN 0031-6997, pages 231 - 248, XP003002000 [A] 1-20 * page 244 - page 245 * |