EP2358595 - PROCESS FOR PACKAGING POTATO CRISPS, AS WELL AS THE PACKAGE OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/34] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING POTATO CRISPS, AS WELL AS THE PACKAGE OBTAINED | ||
[2012/45] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elias, Michael Joseph Suite 4 The Mall Beacon Court Sandyford Industrial Estate Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2023/17] |
Former [2012/41] | Lane, Cathal Michael Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Lane, Cathal Michael 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09744697.5 | 05.11.2009 | [2011/34] | WO2009EP64706 | Priority number, date | IE20080000894 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: IE 20080894 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052279 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358595 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2358595 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2358595 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/22, B65B5/06, B65D77/00 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
B65B5/064 (EP,US);
A23L19/18 (EP,US);
B65B1/22 (EP,US);
B65B39/02 (US);
B65B39/12 (US);
B65B7/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERPACKUNG VON KARTOFFELCHIPS SOWIE ERHALTENE VERPACKUNG | [2012/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR PACKAGING POTATO CRISPS, AS WELL AS THE PACKAGE OBTAINED | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EMBALLER DES CHIPS, AINSI QUE L'EMBALLAGE OBTENU | [2012/45] |
Former [2011/34] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERPACKUNG VON KARTOFFELCHIPS SOWIE ERHALTENE VERPACKUNG | ||
Former [2011/34] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING POTATO CRISPS, AS WELL AS THE PACKAGE OBTAINED | ||
Former [2011/34] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR EMBALLER DES CHIPS, AINSI QUE L'EMBALLAGE OBTENU | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2014
12.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Tyrrells Potato Crisps Limited Tyrrells Court Stretford Bridge Leominster Hereford and Worcester HR6 9DQ / GB Opponent's representative Königer, Karsten Harmsen Utescher Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neuer Wall 80 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2014
12.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Tyrrells Potato Crisps Limited Tyrrells Court Stretford Bridge Leominster Hereford and Worcester HR6 9DQ / GB Opponent's representative Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.2014
12.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Tyrrells Potato Crisps Limited Tyrrells Court Stretford Bridge Leominster Hereford and Worcester HR6 9DQ / GB Opponent's representative Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | 09.04.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.04.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.03.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.02.2016 | Appeal received No. T0481/16 | 29.04.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.02.2016 | Appeal received No. T0481/16 | 01.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2009 | AT | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FI | 05.11.2020 | LU | 05.11.2020 | ES | 06.11.2020 | SE | 06.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | DK | 30.11.2020 | FR | 30.11.2020 | NO | 30.11.2020 | NL | 01.12.2020 | IS | 22.12.2021 | IT | 05.11.2022 | [2023/49] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
ES | 06.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
BE | 30.11.2020 | ||
DK | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
ES | 06.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
DK | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
DK | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
DK | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
SE | 06.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
NL | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FI | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
NO | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 05.11.2009 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2348509 (WHEELER RALPH W) [Y] 1,14-17 * page 1, column 2, line 53 - page 2, column 2, line 27; figure - *; | [Y]GB582276 (ALFRED GERMAN ROSE, et al) [Y] 1,14-17 * page 2, line 54 - line 121; figure - *; | [Y]FR1327914 (J. DALAUDIER) [Y] 16 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 2, column 2, line 16; figure - *; | [A]US4052838 (HILTON BARNEY W, et al); | [YA]US4351141 (GLORFIELD PAUL H, et al) [Y] 1,14,15,17 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 42; figure - * [A] 7,9,11; | [A]EP0249260 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 15 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 17; figure - *; | [A]GB2350597 (LAITT ANDREW [GB]); | [A]WO2008086388 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) | Opposition | US3812643 | EP1270416 | EP1767465 |