Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
23.05.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.11.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.08.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
30.10.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.12.2011 | Change - extension states | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
08.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.11.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2011 | Change - inventor | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
27.05.2011 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
27.05.2011 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
19.05.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.04.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.03.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.05.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.04.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2009 | PCT data prior to European publication |