EP2338121 - HEALTH-RISK METRIC DETERMINATION AND/OR PRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSZEWSKI, Mark, E. c/o 595 Miner Road Cleveland Ohio 44143 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Matthew, J. c/o 595 Miner Road Cleveland Ohio 44143 / US | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09744754.4 | 06.10.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009IB54367 | Priority number, date | US20080104310P | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 104310 P | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041197 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338121 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP,US);
A61B6/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | GESUNDHEITSRISIKO-METRIKBESTIMMUNG UND/ODER PRÄSENTATION | [2011/26] | English: | HEALTH-RISK METRIC DETERMINATION AND/OR PRESENTATION | [2011/26] | French: | DÉTERMINATION ET/OU PRÉSENTATION D'ÉVALUATIONS DE RISQUES SANITAIRES | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 29.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US7149331 (KAUFMAN LEON [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 30 - line 43 *; | [X]US7409079 (SAPTHARISHI RAMKUMAR [IN], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 53 - line 67 *; | [X] - BERND M OHNESORGE ET AL, "CT for imaging coronary artery disease: defining the paradigm for its application", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CARDIAC IMAGING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20050201), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 1573-0743, pages 85 - 104, XP019233839 [X] 1-13 * figure 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10554-004-5346-6 | [X] - KOPP ET AL, "Multidetector-row CT cardiac imaging with 4 and 16 slices for coronary CTA and imaging of atherosclerotic plaques", EUROPEAN RADIOLOGY, vol. 12, no. 2, (20020601), page S17-S24, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/6ajeqabrmmymp6et/fulltext.pdf, (20091215), XP002560497 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * |